Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Philipp Burkhard

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1633Born
1656¹22.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Speyer, Germany
1657¹23.3Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
30 Apr 168551.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
30 Apr 168551.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
1 Jul 168551.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
27 Oct 169865.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp Burkhard
Bishop Johann Philipp Burkhard (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpeyer, Diocese of Speyer

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 9
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,603
  • b/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast