Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hans Schwemmer

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea

Titular Archbishop of Rebellum

Apostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1945BornRiggau, Germany
4 Jul 197125.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 199751.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rebellum
9 Jul 199751.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea
9 Jul 199751.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Solomon Islands
21 Sep 199752.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rebellum
1 Oct 200156.1DiedApostolic Nuncio to Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Hans Schwemmer:
Archbishop Hans Schwemmer (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Papua New Guinea

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,147
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013