Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Bacciu

Deceased

Bishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1838Born
16 Aug 186325.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 189658.7AppointedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
4 Apr 189759.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy
13 Mar 191476.0DiedBishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri), Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Bacciu
Bishop Filippo Bacciu (born , died ) Bishop of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuddus˛, Diocese of Bisarchio o Bisarcio (Ozieri)
Ordained BishopOzieri

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 149
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 86
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1897, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017