Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emile-Fernand Sauvant, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bamako

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1869BornLes Vans, France
2 Jul 189525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
8 Jul 192151.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bamako, Mali
8 Jul 192151.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
10 Aug 192151.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
6 Apr 192858.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bamako, Mali
19 Dec 193970.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bamako, Mali

MicroData Summary for Emile-Fernand Sauvant:
Bishop Emile-Fernand Sauvant M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bamako

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013