Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gustave-Jean-Marie Nouet, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Prefect of Gharda´a nel Sahara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1878BornLa Haie-Fouassiere, France
29 Jun 190223.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
8 Apr 191940.5AppointedPrefect of Gharda´a, Algeria
194162.2DiedPrefect of Gharda´a nel Sahara, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Gustave-Jean-Marie Nouet:
Priest Gustave-Jean-Marie Nouet M. Afr. (born ) Prefect of Gharda´a nel Sahara

  • a priest for 38.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013