Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Chhmar Salas

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

Titular Bishop of Sigus

Apostolic Administrator of Kompong-Cham


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1937Born
2 Feb 196426.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
24 Jun 196426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
6 Apr 197537.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
6 Apr 197537.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
14 Apr 197537.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
3 May 197537.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia
30 Apr 197638.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
Sep 1977³39.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Chhmar Salas
Bishop Joseph Chhmar Salas (born , died Sep 1977) Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreah Meada, Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh
Ordained DeaconSeminary St-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestChrist the King, Cathedral, Phnom-Penh, Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh
Death PlaceTaing Kok, Kampong Thom

  • a priest for 13.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/komp: CB, 5 Nov 2017
  • od/op/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast