Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Niccolini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to France

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1639¹Born
10 Sep 168546.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
19 Oct 168546.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
3 Nov 1685³46.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 168546.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
21 Feb 169051.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
10 Sep 169051.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
4 Feb 169253.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Niccolini (VIAF: 37232050)
Archbishop Francesco Niccolini (born 1639, died ) Apostolic Nuncio of France

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Ordained PriestAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Ordained BishopNoviciat des Jésuites, Church, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Capucins Saint-Honoré, Convent, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 6.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 333
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 15
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 252
  • op/ob/c2+: AT, 2 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 May 2018

Quantcast