Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Mancuso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1902BornPalermo
19 Dec 192523.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 196260.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
14 Jul 196260.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pyrgos
15 Sep 196260.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pyrgos
26 Dec 196361.4SucceededBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
21 Mar 197774.7RetiredBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
11 Mar 197875.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Mancuso:
Bishop Giuseppe Mancuso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mazara del Vallo

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1976
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 143
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1977, Page 335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013