Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferenc di Paolo de Nádasdy-Fogaras

Deceased

Archbishop of Kalocsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1785³BornVienna
5 Aug 180621.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Mar 180722.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 182338.0SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
17 Nov 182338.7ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
8 Feb 182438.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
15 May 184560.2SelectedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
24 Nov 184560.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
22 Jul 185166.4DiedArchbishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferenc di Paolo de Nádasdy-Fogaras:
Archbishop Ferenc di Paolo de Nádasdy-Fogaras (born , died ) Archbishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 156, and Page 386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013