Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József de Belánsky

Deceased

Bishop of Banská Bystrica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1769³BornKisuca-Ujhely
7 Apr 179222.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Aug 179223.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 182354.2SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
24 Nov 182354.3ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
8 Feb 182454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
3 Jan 184373.4DiedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József de Belánsky
Bishop József de Belánsky (born , died ) Bishop of Banská Bystrica

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 12 Feb 2016