Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domonkos Zichy-Vásonkeö

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1808BornWien
14 May 183122.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Jul 183123.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 184032.0SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
14 Dec 184032.4ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
18 Apr 184132.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
24 Feb 184233.6SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
23 May 184233.8ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
1849¹40.4ResignedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
29 Oct 187971.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domonkos Zichy-Vásonkeö:
Bishop Domonkos Zichy-Vásonkeö (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Veszprém

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 325, and Page 395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013