Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Noel Andrew Rucastle

Bishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1968 Born
14 Jul 200032.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Town {Kaapstad}, South Africa
4 May 202052.0AppointedBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa
8 Aug 202052.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oudtshoorn, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Noel Andrew Rucastle
Bishop Noel Andrew Rucastle (born ) Bishop of Oudtshoorn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUpington, Diocese of Keimoes
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oudtshoorn, Diocese of Oudtshoorn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oudtshoorn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2020
  • bp: CB, 4 May 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Jul 2020
  • c34: CB, 31 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast