Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Mduduzi Zungu, O.F.M.

Bishop of Port Elizabeth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1966 BornMbongolwane
19 Jan 198922.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
2 Jul 199428.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
8 Jul 199529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
2 Feb 201447.8AppointedBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
28 Jun 201448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Vincent Mduduzi Zungu:
Bishop Vincent Mduduzi Zungu O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Port Elizabeth

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port Elizabeth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 15 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Jun 2014