Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Cavalla

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1902BornVillafranca d'Asti
6 Sep 192523.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Sep 194644.4AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
28 Oct 194644.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
14 Feb 195451.8DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Cavalla:
Archbishop Vincenzo Cavalla (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013