Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Francesco Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Venafro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1675BornMormanno
24 Sep 174266.8AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
29 Sep 174266.8Ordained BishopBishop of Venafro, Italy
27 Jan 175478.2DiedBishop of Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Francesco Rossi:
Bishop Giuseppe Francesco Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Venafro

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013