Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Romero Barrios

Bishop of El Tigre, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1955 Born
1 Dec 197924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Venezuela
2 Feb 201256.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Venezuela
2 Feb 201256.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Materiana
14 Apr 201257.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Materiana
31 May 201863.1AppointedBishop of El Tigre, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Romero Barrios
Bishop José Manuel Romero Barrios (born ) Bishop of El Tigre

EventPlace
Birth PlacePariaguán
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of El Tigre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 6 Feb 2012
  • c2+: CB, 4 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,417
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast