Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Riezzo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Otranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1904BornSquinzano
21 Aug 192722.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 195853.3AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
29 Jun 195853.5Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
28 Apr 196964.4AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
27 Jan 198176.1RetiredArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
20 Aug 199893.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Riezzo:
Archbishop Nicola Riezzo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Otranto

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013