Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop André Richard, C.S.C.

Archbishop Emeritus of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1937 Born
15 Aug 195619.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
17 Feb 196325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
20 May 198951.8AppointedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
9 Aug 198952.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
16 Mar 200264.7AppointedArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
15 Jun 201274.9RetiredArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for André Richard
Archbishop André Richard C.S.C. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Moncton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Ignace

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Moncton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,461
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast