Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernest Léger

Archbishop Emeritus of Moncton, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1944 BornHaute-Aboujagane
11 Mar 196824.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 199652.7AppointedArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
29 Jan 199752.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
16 Mar 200258.0ResignedArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Ernest Léger:
Archbishop Ernest Léger (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Moncton

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Moncton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015