Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Xavier Elias Pedro Paulo Rey, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia

Titular Bishop of Phacusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1902BornFauch, France
23 Jun 192926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
19 May 194542.8AppointedPrelate of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
19 May 194542.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Phacusa
9 Sep 194543.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phacusa
12 Mar 196663.7ResignedPrelate of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
20 Jan 198481.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Xavier Elias Pedro Paulo Rey:
Bishop Francisco Xavier Elias Pedro Paulo Rey T.O.R. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Guajará-Mirim

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015