Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pl塶ido 聲gel Rey de Lemos, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lugo

Titular Archbishop of Pelusium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1867BornLugo
5 Apr 189022.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 189224.6ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Jan 191749.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ja幯, Spain
18 Jan 191749.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hamatha
25 Feb 191749.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hamatha
18 Dec 191952.1AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
30 Jul 192759.8ResignedBishop of Lugo, Spain
30 Jul 192759.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
12 Feb 194173.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pl塶ido 聲gel Rey de Lemos:
Archbishop Pl塶ido 聲gel Rey de Lemos O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugo

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 50
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations 夗iscopales, Issue 1917, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013