Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcial López y Criado

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1868BornCórdoba
28 Mar 189123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Spain
18 May 191850.4AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
20 Oct 191850.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
15 Feb 193264.1DiedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Marcial López y Criado:
Bishop Marcial López y Criado (born , died ) Bishop of Cádiz y Ceuta

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013