Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucio Angelo Renna, O. Carm.

Bishop Emeritus of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1941 Born
12 Sep 195816.9ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
8 Dec 196221.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
2 Apr 196624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
9 Jun 199957.7AppointedBishop of Avezzano, Italy
12 Sep 199957.9Ordained BishopBishop of Avezzano, Italy
2 Sep 200664.9AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
14 Oct 200665.0InstalledBishop of San Severo, Italy
13 Jan 201775.3RetiredBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lucio Angelo Renna
Bishop Lucio Angelo Renna O. Carm. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Pietro Vernotico

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Severo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,610
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jan 2017