Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Onorato Carcaterra, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ariano, Italy

Titular Bishop of Ipsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1871Born
19 Aug 189019.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Feb 189423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Mar 191443.0AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
3 May 191443.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
27 May 191544.2ResignedBishop of Ariano, Italy
27 May 191544.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Ipsus
14 Mar 194069.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Onorato Carcaterra
Bishop Giovanni Onorato Carcaterra O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForio d’Ischia

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,914, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast