Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-François Puginier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Mauricastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1835BornSaix, France
29 May 185822.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
7 Jun 186630.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
7 Jun 186630.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
26 Jan 186832.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauricastro
3 Nov 186833.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
25 Apr 189256.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul-François Puginier:
Bishop Paul-François Puginier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 33.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013