Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ramírez Navarro

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tlalnepantla, México, México

Titular Bishop of Tlos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1939 Born
15 Aug 196930.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tlalnepantla, México, México
27 Dec 200061.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
27 Dec 200061.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
22 Feb 200161.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
4 Mar 201575.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ramírez Navarro
Bishop Francisco Ramírez Navarro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tlalnepantla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTepatitlán

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,916
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast