Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Joseph de Raffélis de Saint-Sauveur

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1725Born
25 Aug 176438.8SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
17 Dec 176439.1ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
27 Jan 176539.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
28 Apr 179165.5DiedBishop of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Joseph de Raffélis de Saint-Sauveur
Bishop Charles-Joseph de Raffélis de Saint-Sauveur (born , died ) Bishop of Tulle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrange

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 423
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast