Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Joseph Quiqueran de Beaujeu

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Elusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1700Born
25 May 173535.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
28 Aug 173535.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elusa
1737¹36.6SelectedBishop of Mirepoix, France
24 Jul 173737.1DiedTitular Bishop of Elusa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Joseph Quiqueran de Beaujeu
Bishop Charles-Joseph Quiqueran de Beaujeu (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Elusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArles

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 207, and Page 291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast