Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucilo Barrameda Quiambao

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi

Titular Bishop of Nabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1932 BornBacacay
2 Apr 196027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Legazpi, Philippines
23 Mar 198249.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Legazpi, Philippines
23 Mar 198249.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nabala
27 Apr 198249.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nabala
10 Dec 200977.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Legazpi, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Lucilo Barrameda Quiambao:
Bishop Lucilo Barrameda Quiambao (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Legazpi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Legazpi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 20 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 21 Jul 2015