Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Querejeta Mendizábal, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Isabela

Titular Bishop of Eressus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1921BornUrrestilla, Spain
9 Jun 194624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
24 Oct 196341.9AppointedPrelate of Isabela, Philippines
24 Oct 196341.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Eressus
25 Jan 196442.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eressus
28 Jan 198967.1ResignedPrelate of Isabela, Philippines
26 Sep 199775.8DiedPrelate Emeritus of Isabela, Philippines

MicroData Summary for José María Querejeta Mendizábal:
Bishop José María Querejeta Mendizábal C.M.F. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Isabela

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Apr 2014