Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luca Torreggiani (Torrigiani)

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Sep 1645AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
15 Oct 1645Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
2 Dec 1669DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Torreggiani (Torrigiani):
Archbishop Luca Torreggiani (Torrigiani) (died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 292
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 110, Number 671
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 25 Mar 2015