Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Boekenfoehr, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kimberley, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1903Born
11 Jul 192724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
24 Mar 195350.1AppointedBishop of Kimberley, South Africa
3 May 195350.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kimberley, South Africa
1 Jul 197471.4ResignedBishop of Kimberley, South Africa
7 Aug 198279.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kimberley, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Boekenfoehr
Bishop John Boekenfoehr O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kimberley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWest Point, NE, USA

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast