Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Khamsé Vithavong, O.M.I.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Vientiane, Laos

Titular Bishop of Moglaena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1942 Born
26 Jan 197532.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Nov 198240.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos
19 Nov 198240.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Moglaena
16 Jan 198340.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Moglaena
7 Apr 198441.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos
2 Feb 201774.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Vientiane, Laos

MicroData Summary for Jean Khamsé Vithavong
Bishop Jean Khamsé Vithavong O.M.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Vientiane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKeng Sadoc

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Vientiane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Feb 2017