Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Starčević

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1877BornMrkopalj
1 Jul 193255.3AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
28 Aug 193255.5Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
24 Nov 193457.7DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Starčević:
Bishop Ivan Starčević (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1932, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 May 2014