Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tulio Luis Ramírez Padilla

Bishop of Guarenas, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1960 Born
5 Aug 198424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia en Venezuela
4 Apr 201252.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
4 Apr 201252.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
8 Jul 201252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausuccura
11 Dec 202060.7AppointedBishop of Guarenas, Venezuela
6 Feb 202160.9InstalledBishop of Guarenas, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Tulio Luis Ramírez Padilla
Bishop Tulio Luis Ramírez Padilla (born ) Bishop of Guarenas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopCathedral, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guarenas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 20 Apr 2012
  • c34: CB, 8 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,498
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Dec 2020
  • i: AM, 17 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast