Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Piola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Biella, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1921Born
27 May 194423.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 197049.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Novara, Italy
18 Jul 197049.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Atella
6 Sep 197049.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Atella
15 Feb 197250.8AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
15 May 198665.1ResignedBishop of Biella, Italy
6 Aug 199372.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Piola
Bishop Vittorio Piola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Biella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalonno di Invorio Inferiore

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast