Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Parsi, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1800Born
30 Jul 184747.2AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
19 Sep 184747.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
24 Feb 186362.7DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria

MicroData Summary for Angelo Parsi
Bishop Angelo Parsi C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivitavecchia, Italy
Ordained BishopSanti Giovanni e Paolo al Celio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 413
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1847, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016