Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Mastai-Ferretti

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1751BornSenigallia
23 Sep 177524.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 180655.3AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
31 Aug 180655.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
26 Jun 182271.1DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Mastai-Ferretti:
Bishop Andrea Mastai-Ferretti (born , died ) Bishop of Pesaro

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013