Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Marie Piazzoli, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

Titular Bishop of Clazomenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1845Born
1 Nov 186823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
11 Jan 189549.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China
11 Jan 189549.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
19 May 189550.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
26 Dec 190459.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang], China

MicroData Summary for Louis Marie Piazzoli
Bishop Louis Marie Piazzoli P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNese, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopHong Kong, Vicariate Apostolic of Hong Kong [Xianggang]

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 209
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jun 2017