Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gallagher

Deceased

Bishop of Goulburn, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1846Born
1 Nov 186923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Goulburn, Australia
29 Mar 189548.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Goulburn, Australia
29 Mar 189548.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
7 Jul 189549.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
13 Jun 190053.9SucceededBishop of Goulburn, Australia
26 Nov 192377.3DiedBishop of Goulburn, Australia

MicroData Summary for John Gallagher
Bishop John Gallagher (born , died ) Bishop of Goulburn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastlederg, Diocese of Derry, Ireland
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Goulburn, Diocese of Goulburn

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 76, and Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017