Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Perrachon, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyeri

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1886BornTorino, Italy
27 Jun 190922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
18 Dec 192539.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kenya, Kenya
18 Dec 192539.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
10 Mar 192639.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nyeri, Kenya
11 Apr 192639.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
18 Oct 193044.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nyeri, Kenya
14 Apr 194457.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyeri, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Perrachon:
Bishop Giuseppe Perrachon I.M.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Nyeri

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013