Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Vincenzo Tasso, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1850Born
29 Mar 187322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
30 Mar 190857.6AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
28 May 190857.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
24 Aug 191969.0DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vincenzo Tasso
Bishop Giovanni Vincenzo Tasso C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontiglio

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 73
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast