Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillermo Rojas y Arrieta, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1855Born
22 Nov 188227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 Mar 191256.7AppointedBishop of Panamá
18 Aug 191257.1Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
14 Dec 192570.4AppointedArchbishop of Panamá
9 May 192670.8InstalledArchbishop of Panamá
4 Feb 193377.6DiedArchbishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Rojas y Arrieta
Archbishop Guillermo Rojas y Arrieta C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Panamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartago, Costa Rica

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast