Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flavio Roberto Carraro, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Verona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1932 BornSandon di FossÚ
25 Mar 195321.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Mar 195725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Jun 198250.3ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Jun 198856.4ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Jun 199462.3CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Jun 199664.3AppointedBishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
7 Aug 199664.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
25 Jul 199866.4AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
8 May 200775.2RetiredBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Flavio Roberto Carraro (VIAF: 89092340)
Bishop Flavio Roberto Carraro O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Verona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Verona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,778
  • mige: AJ, 17 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016