Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Canilla

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

Titular Bishop of Lystra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1846BornGibraltar
8 Mar 188134.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar
8 Mar 188134.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
12 Jun 188135.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
18 Oct 189852.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Canilla:
Bishop Gonzalo Canilla (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Gibraltar

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013