Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Márton Bíró de Padány

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1696³BornPadány
20 Dec 172125.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Mar 172225.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 174548.9SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
19 Jul 174549.2ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
15 Aug 174549.3Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
16 Aug 176266.3DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Márton Bíró de Padány:
Bishop Márton Bíró de Padány (born , died ) Bishop of Veszprém

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015