Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florencio Félix Paredes Cruz, C.R.L.

Prelate of Humahuaca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1961 Born
1 Feb 199129.2ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
9 Nov 199534.0Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
10 Mar 201856.3AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Humahuaca, Argentina
28 Apr 201856.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Humahuaca, Argentina
23 Oct 201957.9SucceededPrelate of Humahuaca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Florencio Félix Paredes Cruz
Bishop Florencio Félix Paredes Cruz C.R.L. (born ) Prelate of Humahuaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSococha, Diocese of Potosí, Bolivia
Ordained PriestSagrado Corazón de Jesús, Church, San Salvador de Jujuy
Ordained BishopMonumento a los Héroes de la Independencia, Humahuaca, Territorial Prelature of Humahuaca

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Humahuaca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2018
  • prof/op: CB, 10 Mar 2018
  • bp: CB, 13 Mar 2018
  • ob: CB, 20 Mar 2018
  • c2+: CB, 25 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,771
  • s: Bollettino, 23 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast