Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Velasio Cardinal De Paolis, C.S. †

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

Cardinal-Deacon of Ges¨ Buon Pastore alla Montagnola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1935Born
20 Sep 195520.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
4 Oct 195823.0Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
18 Mar 196125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
30 Dec 200368.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
30 Dec 200368.2AppointedSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura
21 Feb 200468.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
12 Apr 200872.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thelepte
12 Apr 200872.5AppointedPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
20 Nov 201075.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Ges¨ Buon Pastore alla Montagnola
20 Nov 201075.1Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 201175.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Ges¨ Buon Pastore alla Montagnola
21 Sep 201176.0RetiredPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
9 Sep 201781.9DiedPresident Emeritus of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

MicroData Summary for Velasio De Paolis (VIAF: 60218809)
Velasio Cardinal De Paolis C.S. (born , died ) President Emeritus of Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSonnino, Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
Ordained PriestCasa Madre degli Scalabriniani, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,534
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2008
  • i: Bollettino, 10 May 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2011
  • d: CB, 9 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017