Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Outhay Thepmany

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Savannakhet

Titular Bishop of Sfasferia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1935BornThakhek
29 Jun 196328.4Ordained PriestPriest of Savannakhet, Laos
10 Jul 197540.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Savannakhet, Laos
10 Jul 197540.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
24 Aug 197540.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sfasferia
21 Apr 199762.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Savannakhet, Laos
19 Mar 199863.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Savannakhet, Laos

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Outhay Thepmany:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Outhay Thepmany (born 1935, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Savannakhet

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015