Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Bourlier

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1731Born
9 Apr 180271.1SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
17 Apr 180271.2ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
23 Apr 180271.2Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
30 Oct 182190.7DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Bourlier
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Bourlier (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 183
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast